+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/04/2018; Chapter 161; Eff. 1/1/2019
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/03/2018
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); SJ 17
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; SJ 13
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; SC 17
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/03/2018, Room 100, SH, 01:45 pm; SC 15
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 7
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0423h: MA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 16
- Amendment # 2018-0423h: AA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 16
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0423h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 9 P. 9
- Executive Session: 02/20/2018 LOB 302
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:00 AM LOB 302
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 10:15 AM LOB 302
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/23/2018 11:35 AM LOB 302
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 01:15 PM LOB 302
On November 13, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 20
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor