+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 10, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/28/2018; Chapter 341; Eff. 07/01/2018
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/10/2018
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); SJ 18
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: RC 14Y-10N, MA; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; SJ 16
- Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2018-1861s, RC 10Y-14N, AF; 05/03/2018; SJ 16
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018;
- Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, MA; 05/02/2018 SJ 15
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; SC 19A
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: RC 13Y-10N, MA; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/26/2018; SJ 14
- Special Order to the present time, Without Objection, MA; 04/26/2018; SJ 14
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/26/2018; SC 18
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/04/2018, Room 100, SH, 09:10 am; SC 15
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 10
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reconsider HB 1686 (Rep. Hinch): MF DV 146-171 03/15/2018 HJ 8 P. 57
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0155h and 0831h: MA RC 168-147 03/15/2018 HJ 8 P. 55
- FLAM # 2018-0831h (Rep. Lang): AA VV 03/15/2018 HJ 8 P. 55
- Amendment # 2018-0155h: AA VV 03/15/2018 HJ 8 P. 54
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection HJ 7 P. 49
- Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): MA VV by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 125
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0155h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 13-10; RC) HC 9 P. 66
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/24/2018 LOB 202
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 01/24/2018 11:00 AM LOB 202
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 02:00 PM LOB 202
On November 13, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Ways and Means HJ 1 P. 20
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
May 3, 2018: Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment 1861s
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 24
May 3, 2018: Ought to Pass
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
April 26, 2018: Ought to Pass
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 1
March 15, 2018: OTPA
- Yeas: 168
- Nays: 147
- Present/NV: 24
- Absent: 53