+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 88; Eff. 7/24/2018
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); SJ 15
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 04/26/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; SJ 13
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; SC 17
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/11/2018, Room 101, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 16
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 7
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 40
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-0; CC) HC 9 P. 22
- Executive Session: 02/27/2018 LOB 306
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/16/2018 01:00 PM LOB 306
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2018 02:30 PM LOB 306
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/01/2018 02:00 PM LOB 306
On November 13, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 1 P. 19
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor