+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 22, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2024; Chapter 208; eff. 09/10/2024
On June 27, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16
On June 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/22/2024; SJ 14
On May 14, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024, Vote 7-0; SC 20
On May 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 05/14/2024, Room 103, SH, 01:30 pm, on proposed non-germane amendment # 2024-1873s; SC 19
On April 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 103, SH, 01:30 pm; SC 16
On April 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 04/11/2024 and Referred to Finance; SJ 10
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Lay HB1678 on Table (Rep. Osborne): MF DV 181-192 04/11/2024 HJ 11 P. 99
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MF RC 179-193 04/11/2024 HJ 11 P. 99
- Ought to Pass: MA DV 191-182 04/11/2024 HJ 11 P. 101
On March 29, 2024 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/26/2024 (Vote 13-12; RC) HC 14 P. 16
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
On March 13, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/19/2024 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Division Work Session: 03/13/2024 02:30 pm LOB 212
On February 15, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-0381h: AA VV 02/15/2024 HJ 5 P. 6
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0381h: MA VV 02/15/2024 HJ 5 P. 7
- Referred to Finance 02/15/2024 HJ 5 P. 7
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0381h 01/31/2024 (Vote 17-3; CC) HC 6 P. 4
On January 25, 2024 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/30/2024 10:00 am LOB 205-207
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 01/31/2024 10:00 am LOB 205-207
On January 5, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 10:00 am LOB 205-207
On December 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education HJ 1 P. 29
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor