+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 31, 2024 in the House:
- Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 10-0)
On August 21, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/17/2024 11:00 am LOB 306-308
On February 15, 2024 in the House:
- Refer for Interim Study: MA VV 02/15/2024 HJ 5 P. 11
On February 8, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 02/07/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 6 P. 6
On February 5, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2024 09:00 am LOB 306-308
On January 31, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/07/2024 10:30 am LOB 306-308
On January 29, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/02/2024 11:00 am LOB 306-308
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/25/2024 01:30 pm LOB 306-308
On December 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 1 P. 29