+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On October 31, 2024 in the House:
- Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 16-0)
On September 26, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2024 02:30 pm LOB 302-304
On September 25, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/17/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On August 14, 2024 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 09/11/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On February 22, 2024 in the House:
- Refer for Interim Study: MA VV 02/22/2024 HJ 6 P. 54
On February 12, 2024 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 02/07/2024 (Vote 14-5; RC)
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0373h
On January 31, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/07/2024 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On January 25, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/31/2024 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/24/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On January 3, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/09/2024 11:00 am LOB 306-308
On December 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 29