+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 14, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/14/2024 HJ 8 P. 47
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/21/2024 (Vote 16-4; RC)
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
On February 15, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/20/2024 09:15 am LOB 205-207
On January 31, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/06/2024 01:00 pm LOB 205-207
On December 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education HJ 1 P. 29
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor