+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 22, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/22/2024 HJ 6 P. 13
On February 13, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/07/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC)
On January 31, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/07/2024 01:00 pm LOB 307
On January 5, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/10/2024 02:00 pm LOB 206-208
On December 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services HJ 1 P. 29
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor