+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA RC 292-39 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 69
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-4; RC) HC 9 P. 37
- Executive Session: 02/21/2018 LOB 302
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:00 AM LOB 305
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/14/2018 02:00 PM LOB 302
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/07/2018 02:00 PM LOB 302
On November 13, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 19
+ − Vote
March 6, 2018: ITL
- Yeas: 292
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 24
- Absent: 37