+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 21, 2024 in the House:
- Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Weber): MA RC 181-164 03/21/2024 HJ 9 P. 100
On March 12, 2024 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/06/2024 (Vote 12-8; RC)
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0972h
On February 27, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/06/2024 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/21/2024 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On December 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary HJ 1 P. 28
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor