+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 177; Eff. 1/1/2017
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/19/2016 HJ 39 P. 24
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); SJ 19
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1971e: AA VV 05/11/2016 HJ 38 P. 129
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1971e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 05/12/2016); SJ 18
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/05/2016; SJ 16
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/05/2016; SC 17
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/14/2016; SJ 13
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/14/2016; SC 14
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/05/2016, Room 204, LOB, 01:00 pm; SC 13
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 10
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0846h: MA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 40
- Amendment #2016-0846h: AA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 40
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0846h (NT) for 03/09/2016 (Vote 16-0; CC) HC 14 P. 24
- Executive Session: 03/02/2016 10:00 AM LOB 205
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 03/02/2016 09:00 AM LOB 205
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 4 P. 22
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/04/2016 09:00 AM LOB 205