+ − Actions (20)
On September 17, 2020 in the House:
- Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: RC 191-142 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
On July 29, 2020 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/28/2020
On July 6, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/30/2020 HJ 10 P. 70
On July 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); SJ 9
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: RC 14Y-10N, MA; OT3rdg; 03/12/2020; SJ 7
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, MA; 03/11/2020 SJ 6
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/11/2020; SC 10
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/03/2020, Room 100, SH, 09:15 am; SC 9
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/13/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 5
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment # 2020-0050h: AA VV 02/19/2020 HJ 4 P. 62
- Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety 02/19/2020 HJ 4 P. 62
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0050h: MA RC 206-144 02/19/2020 HJ 4 P. 62
- Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 02/19/2020 HJ 4 P. 102
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0050h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 12-9; RC) HC 7 P. 22
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm LOB 205
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2020 09:00 am LOB 205
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2020 09:00 am LOB 205
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 01:00 pm LOB 205
On December 16, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 1 P. 30
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2020: Ought to Pass
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Nay
- David Watters: Yea
- Sharon Carson: Nay
- John Reagan: Nay
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Martha Fuller Clark: Yea
- Chuck Morse: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Nay
- Shannon Chandley: Yea
- James Gray: Nay
- Melanie Levesque: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Yea
- Dan Feltes: Yea
- Harold French: Nay
- Martha Hennessey: Yea
- Bob Giuda: Nay
- Ruth Ward: Nay
- Jay Kahn: Yea
- Kevin Cavanaugh: Yea
- David Starr: Nay
- Jeanne Dietsch: Yea
- Jon Morgan: Yea
- Tom Sherman: Yea
February 19, 2020: OTPA
- Yeas: 206
- Nays: 144
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 33
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Nay
- David Watters: Yea
- Sharon Carson: Nay
- John Reagan: Nay
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Martha Fuller Clark: Yea
- Chuck Morse: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Nay
- Shannon Chandley: Yea
- James Gray: Nay
- Melanie Levesque: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Yea
- Dan Feltes: Yea
- Harold French: Nay
- Martha Hennessey: Yea
- Bob Giuda: Nay
- Ruth Ward: Nay
- Jay Kahn: Yea
- Kevin Cavanaugh: Yea
- David Starr: Nay
- Jeanne Dietsch: Yea
- Jon Morgan: Yea
- Tom Sherman: Yea
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor