+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 40
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-0; CC) HC 9 P. 22
- Executive Session: 02/20/2018 LOB 306
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- ==ROOM CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2018 01:00 PM LOB 202
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 09:00 AM LOB 306
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 11:00 AM LOB 306
On November 13, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 1 P. 18
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor