+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/14/2023 HJ 5
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB164 01/30/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 11 P. 8
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/30/2023 01:00 pm LOB 206-208
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 11:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 3, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Judiciary