+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 18
On March 20, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/20/2024 (Vote 17-0; CC) HC 12 P. 9
On March 13, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/20/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
- ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/19/2024 10:00 am LOB 307
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 03/13/2024 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/25/2024 02:45 pm LOB 302-304
On December 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 27