+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 6, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 08/02/2024; Chapter 347; eff. 10/01/2024 HJ 16
On July 23, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 56
On July 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On June 13, 2024 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2024-2215c: Adopted, VV 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 33
On June 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2024-2215c, Adopted, VV; 06/13/2024; SJ 17
On June 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2024-2215c; 06/13/2024
On June 3, 2024 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting: 06/03/2024 09:30 am LOB 302-304
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Avard Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
- President Appoints: Senators Avard, Pearl, Watters; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 29, 2024 in the House:
- House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1828s and 2024-1897s and Requests CofC (Reps. Vose, D. Thomas, Harrington, Bernardy): MA VV 05/28/2024 HJ 14 P. 178
On May 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/23/2024; SJ 15
On May 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Special Order to 05/23/2024, Without Objection, MA; 05/22/2024 SJ 14
On May 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024, Vote 7-0; SC 20A
On May 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Special Order to Beginning of Calendar, Without Objection, MA; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1828s, AA, VV; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
- Sen. Avard Floor Amendment # 2024-1897s, AA, VV; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 2024-1828s, and 2024-1897s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1828s, 05/16/2024, Vote 4-0; SC 19
On April 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:20 am; SC 15
On March 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 7
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-0782h: AA DV 182-169 03/07/2024 HJ 7 P. 94
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0782h: MA RC 184-168 03/07/2024 HJ 7 P. 97
- Reconsider HB1623 (Rep. Sweeney): MF DV 165-179 03/07/2024 HJ 7 P. 107
On February 23, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/20/2024 (Vote 10-10; RC) HC 9 P. 31
On February 7, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/20/2024 01:00 pm LOB 302-304
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/20/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On January 22, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/30/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On December 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy HJ 1 P. 27