+ − Actions (8)
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, MA, VV; 06/16/2020; SJ 8
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0890h: MA VV 03/12/2020 HJ 8 P. 204
- Amendment # 2020-0890h: AA VV 03/12/2020 HJ 8 P. 204
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0890h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 10-9; RC) HC 10 P. 76
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/26/2020 10:00 am LOB 203
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/18/2020 10:30 am LOB 203
On December 6, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation HJ 1 P. 29