+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On October 31, 2024 in the House:
- Interim Study Report: Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 16-1)
On July 22, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 09/18/2024 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On March 21, 2024 in the House:
- Refer for Interim Study: MA VV 03/21/2024 HJ 9 P. 11
On March 12, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 03/06/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC)
On February 20, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/06/2024 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/14/2024 01:45 pm LOB 206-208
On December 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary HJ 1 P. 27