+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 6, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 08/02/2024; Chapter 346; 10/01/2024 HJ 16
On July 23, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 56
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2344e: AA VV (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 50
On July 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On July 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2344e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 31, 2024 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1642s (Rep. Janigian): MA VV 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 25
On April 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1642s, AA, VV; 05/02/2024; SJ 11
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1642s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/02/2024; SJ 11
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1642s, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 17
On March 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/10/2024, Room 100, SH, 10:30 am; SC 13
On March 21, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-0702h: AA VV 03/21/2024 HJ 9 P. 19
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0702h: MA VV 03/21/2024 HJ 9 P. 19
On March 15, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0702h 03/11/2024 (Vote 18-0; CC)
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/11/2024 10:30 am LOB 202-204
- Full Committee Work Session: 03/11/2024 09:30 am LOB 202-204
On February 28, 2024 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/06/2024 01:30 pm LOB 202-204
- Full Committee Work Session: 03/06/2024 09:30 am LOB 202-204
On February 7, 2024 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/14/2024 10:00 am LOB 202-204
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/13/2024 10:00 am LOB 202-204
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/31/2024 12:00 pm LOB 202-204
On December 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Ways and Means HJ 1 P. 26