+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 30, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/26/2024; Chapter 273; eff. 07/01/2024
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 51
On July 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 31, 2024 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1477s (Rep. W. MacDonald): MA VV 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 19
On April 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1477s, AA, VV; 04/18/2024; SJ 10
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1477s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/18/2024; SJ 10
On April 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1477s, 04/18/2024, Vote 5-0; SC 15
On April 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- ==ROOM CHANGE== Hearing: 04/03/2024, Room 100, SH, 09:30 am; SC 13A
On March 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 8
On March 14, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-0755h: AA VV 03/14/2024 HJ 8 P. 8
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0755h: MA VV 03/14/2024 HJ 8 P. 8
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0755h 02/21/2024 (Vote 19-0; CC)
On February 15, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/21/2024 11:00 am LOB 203
On February 7, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/15/2024 10:20 am LOB 210-211
On December 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 1 P. 26
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor