+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 192; Eff. 8/7/2018
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/10/2018
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); SJ 18
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1942e: AA VV 05/10/2018
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1942e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 05/10/2018); SJ 18
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; SJ 15
- Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, MA, VV; 05/02/2018; SJ 15
- Pending Motion OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; SJ 15
- Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 05/02/2018; SJ 15
- Ought to Pass: RC 13Y-11N, MA; 05/02/2018; SJ 15
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; SC 19
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/24/2018, Room 100, SH, 01:00 pm; SC 16
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 7
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0621h: MA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 12
- Amendment # 2018-0621h: AA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 12
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0621h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-1; CC) HC 9 P. 7
- Executive Session: 02/20/2018 LOB 302
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2018 09:00 AM LOB 302
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/25/2018 01:45 PM LOB 302
On November 13, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 17
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
May 2, 2018: Ought to Pass
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 24