+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 27, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 08/23/2024; Chapter 372; Eff: 08/23/2024 HJ 16
On July 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On July 29, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 56
On July 23, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2366e: AA VV (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 56
On July 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2366e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On June 13, 2024 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2024-2214c: Adopted, VV 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 31
On June 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2024-2214c, Adopted, VV; 06/13/2024; SJ 17
On June 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2024-2214c; 06/13/2024
On June 3, 2024 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting: 06/03/2024 10:30 am LOB 302-304
On May 31, 2024 in the Senate:
- Conferee Change; Senators Avard, Pearl, Watters Replace Senators Bradley Carson and Soucy; SJ 17
On May 31, 2024 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1816s (Rep. Vose): MF DV 169-174 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 22
- House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1816s and Requests CofC (Rep. Vose): MA VV 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 22
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Vose, D. Thomas, Cormen, McGhee 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 23
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Avard Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
- President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Carson, Soucy; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Special Order to Beginning of Calendar, Without Objection, MA; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1816s, AA, VV; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1816s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
On May 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1816s, 05/16/2024, Vote 4-0; SC 19
On April 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:10 am; SC 15
On March 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 7
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-0764h: AA VV 03/07/2024 HJ 7 P. 23
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0764h: MA VV 03/07/2024 HJ 7 P. 23
On February 23, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0764h 02/20/2024 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 9 P. 14
On February 7, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/20/2024 01:00 pm LOB 302-304
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/20/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/29/2024 02:00 pm LOB 302-304
On December 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy HJ 1 P. 26
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor