+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA DV 295-50 03/14/2019 HJ 9 P. 10
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Special Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection HJ 8 P. 60
- Removed from Consent (Rep. Prudhomme-O'Brien) 03/07/2019 HJ 8 P. 3
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 14 P. 2
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 02:00 pm LOB 302
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am LOB 302
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm LOB 302
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am LOB 302
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/22/2019 01:30 pm LOB 302
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2019 09:30 am LOB 302
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 11:15 am LOB 302
On December 27, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 2 P. 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor