+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 22-0; CC) HC 23 P. 4
On April 23, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/30/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/95408968840
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/18/2020 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm LOB 209
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Finance 02/19/2020 HJ 4 P. 94
- Removed from Consent (Rep. McGuire) 02/19/2020 HJ 4 P. 2
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0266h: MA VV 02/19/2020 HJ 4 P. 94
- Amendment # 2020-0266h: AA VV 02/19/2020 HJ 4 P. 94
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0266h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 15-1; CC) HC 7 P. 10
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/28/2020 10:30 am LOB 307
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 02:30 pm LOB 307
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources HJ 1 P. 28