+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 22, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 141; eff. 01/01/2025
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 45
On June 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On June 14, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2253e: AA VV (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 15 P. 42
On June 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2253e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 19
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
On April 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 100, SH, 01:00 pm; SC 15
On April 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 8
On March 28, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-0840h: AA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 17
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0840h: MA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 17
On March 18, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0840h 03/13/2024 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 12 P. 9
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On February 21, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2024 10:30 am LOB 302-304
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On February 7, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2024 01:00 pm LOB 306-308
On January 31, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/06/2024 11:00 am LOB 305
On December 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 26
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor