+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/08/2017 HJ 9 P. 31
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 18-0; CC)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/22/2017 10:00 AM LOB 205
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 10:09 AM Representatives Hall
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 2 P. 18