+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On October 31, 2024 in the House:
- Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 16-0)
On September 25, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/17/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On August 14, 2024 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 09/12/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On March 28, 2024 in the House:
- Refer for Interim Study: MA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 17
On March 20, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 03/13/2024 (Vote 17-0; CC) HC 12 P. 9
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On February 7, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2024 01:00 pm LOB 306-308
On January 31, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/06/2024 10:00 am LOB 305
On December 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 25
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor