+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 5
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB158-FN 02/10/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 12 P. 4
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/10/2023 11:00 am LOB 202-204
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/27/2023 02:15 pm LOB 202-204
On January 3, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety