+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Transportation HJ 4 P. 19
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/04/2016 HJ 11 P. 9
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/04/2016 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 5 P. 4
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/26/2016 02:30 PM LOB203
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 11:40 AM LOB203