+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 30, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/26/2024; Chapter 270; eff. 09/24/2024
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 51
On July 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 31, 2024 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1829s (Rep. Renzullo): MA VV 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 22
On May 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1829s, AA, VV; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1829s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
- Special Order to Beginning of Calendar, Without Objection, MA; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1829s, 05/16/2024, Vote 4-0; SC 19
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:40 am; SC 18
On April 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 8
On March 28, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-0969h (NT): AA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 94
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0969h: MA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 94
On March 20, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0969h (NT) 03/13/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 12 P. 18
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:30 am LOB 305
- Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2024-0969h: 03/13/2024 10:15 am LOB305
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/21/2024 02:30 pm LOB 305
On December 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development HJ 1 P. 24
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor