+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 71
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 14 P. 45
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Ways and Means HJ 4 P. 18
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/18/2016 11:30 AM LOB 202
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session: 02/04/2016 11:00 AM LOB 202
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/21/2016 10:30 AM LOB202
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor