+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1023h (Vote 13-9; RC) HC 23 P. 9
On May 14, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/21/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/91769986281
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/18/2020 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am LOB 209
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from Consent (Rep. Piemonte) 02/13/2020 HJ 3 P. 2
- Referred to Finance 02/13/2020 HJ 3 P. 26
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0133h: MA VV 02/13/2020 HJ 3 P. 26
- Amendment # 2020-0133h: AA VV 02/13/2020 HJ 3 P. 26
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0133h for 02/13/2020 (Vote 18-2; CC) HC 5 P. 2
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/28/2020 01:00 pm LOB 207
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 02:30 pm LOB 207
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/14/2020 11:00 am LOB 207
On December 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education HJ 1 P. 26
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor