+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On October 28, 2016 in the House:
- Interim Study Report: Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 19-0)
On September 20, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/12/2016 10:00 AM LOB 202
On September 6, 2016 in the House:
- Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2016 10:00 AM LOB 202
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Refer for Interim Study: MA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 70
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/09/2016 (Vote 21-0; CC) HC 14 P. 77
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/02/2016 10:00 AM LOB 202
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Ways and Means HJ 4 P. 18
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/18/2016 10:00 AM LOB 202
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/04/2016 10:00 AM LOB 202
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/21/2016 10:00 AM LOB202
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor