+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 22
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 17-0; CC) HC 14 P. 14
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/01/2016 09:30 AM LOB 308
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/16/2016 09:30 AM LOB 308
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Election Law HJ 4 P. 18
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 10:50 AM LOB308