+ − Actions (8)
On October 6, 2020 in the House:
- Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 18-0)
On August 19, 2020 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 09/03/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/93480617681 - Executive Session to Follow
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Refer for Interim Study: MA VV 03/11/2020 HJ 7 P. 34
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 10 P. 20
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am LOB 205
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2020 10:00 am LOB 205
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/05/2020 10:00 am LOB 202
On December 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 1 P. 26