+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 28, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 16
On March 20, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/13/2024 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 12 P. 8
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On February 21, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2024 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On January 9, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On December 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 24
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor