+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 05/02/2018; SJ 15
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/02/2018; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 19
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/09/2018, Room 100, SH, 02:00 pm; SC 16
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 5
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/08/2018 HJ 3 P. 3
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 5 P. 6
- Executive Session: 01/30/2018 LOB 204
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/30/2018 11:00 AM LOB 204
On November 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 1 P. 14
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor