+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of Conference Report: Not signed off; HC 42A, PG. 2001
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; SJ 15
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/22/2014; 2:00 PM; LOB 302
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conferee Change; Senator Cataldo Replaces Senator Prescott
- President Appoints: Senators Prescott, Odell, and Woodburn
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sen. Prescott Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Schlachman, Hammond, Heden, Sandblade
- Non-Concur with Senate AM and Requests C of C (Rep. Butler) MA VV
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1434s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 10
- Committee Amendment 1434s, NT, AA, VV
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1434s, NT, 4/24/14; SC15
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/2/14, Room 101, LOB, 9:45 a.m.; SC12
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced 3/13/2014 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0880h(NT) MA VV
- Adopt Amendment #2014-0880h (New Title) AA VV
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Proposed Committee Amendment #2014-0880h (New Title)
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0880h, NT (Vote 12-1; RC); HC 19
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/04/2014 1:15 PM LOB 302
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 3/4/2014 9:30 AM LOB 302
- ===CANCELLED=== Executive Session: 2/18/2014 2:00 PM LOB 302
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/18/2014 9:00 AM LOB 302
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/11/2014 9:00 AM LOB 302
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/4/2014 10:00 AM LOB 302
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs