+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 20, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Hassan 06/10/2016; Chapter 237; Eff. 6/10/2016
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/01/2016 HJ 42 P. 58
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); SJ 20
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1616s (Reps. A. Christie, Kurk): MA DV 143-121 05/19/2016 HJ 39 P. 20
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1616s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/05/2016; SJ 16
- Committee Amendment 1616s, NT, RC 24Y-0N, AA; 05/05/2016 SJ 16
- Without Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment #2016-1616s, NT, 2/3 Necessary, MA; 05/05/2016; SJ 16
- Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment, 05/05/2016 SJ 16
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1616s, NT, 05/05/2016; SC 17
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/26/2016, Room 103, SH, 01:00 pm, on proposed amendment #2016-1533s; SC 16
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/19/2016, Room 103, SH, 01:00 pm; SC 15
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/24/2016 and Referred to Finance; SJ 11
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/23/2016 HJ 27 P. 16
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/23/2016 (Vote 25-0; RC) HC 19 P. 7
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/02/2016 01:00 PM LOB 210-211
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 03/01/2016 01:05 PM LOB 212
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 4 P. 17
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Finance 02/10/2016 HJ 16 P. 24
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/10/2016 HJ 16 P. 24
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/10/2016 (Vote 13-3; RC) HC 7 P. 11
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/27/2016 01:00 PM LOB 306
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 01/21/2016 11:45 AM LOB 306
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 11:30 AM LOB306
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
May 5, 2016: Committee Amendment 1616s
- Yeas: 24
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor