+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, MA, VV; 06/16/2020; SJ 8
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0999h (NT): MA VV 03/11/2020 HJ 7 P. 14
- Amendment # 2020-0999h (NT): AA VV 03/11/2020 HJ 7 P. 14
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0999h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 10 P. 10
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am LOB 204 (if necessary)
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm LOB 204
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/25/2020 01:00 pm LOB 204
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am LOB 204
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/05/2020 01:00 pm LOB 204
- Public Hearing: 01/29/2020 02:00 pm LOB 204
On December 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 1 P. 25