+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reconsider HB 1516 (Rep. Shurtleff): MF DV 141-185 03/06/2018
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 120
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 11-9; RC) HC 9 P. 49
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/20/2018 LOB 302
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2018 09:30 AM LOB 302
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:30 AM LOB 302
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 01:15 PM LOB 302
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/12/2018 10:15 AM LOB 302
On November 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor