+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On August 19, 2020 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 09/22/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97236261808 - Executive Session to Follow
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Refer for Interim Study: MA VV 03/11/2020 HJ 7 P. 18
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 10 P. 11
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/26/2020 10:00 am LOB 207
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 10:00 am LOB 207
On December 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education HJ 1 P. 25