+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 41
On November 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 50 P. 8
On October 11, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am LOB 303
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/05/2019 12:30 pm LOB 303
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 10:00 am LOB 303
On December 27, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture HJ 2 P. 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor