+ − Actions (9)
On August 19, 2020 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 09/02/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98387930737 - Executive Session to Follow
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Refer for Interim Study: MA VV 03/12/2020 HJ 8 P. 218
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from Consent (Rep. Sylvia) 03/11/2020 HJ 7 P. 1
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 10 P. 7
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:30 am LOB 302
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/24/2020 09:00 am LOB 302
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2020 10:00 am LOB 302
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 01:15 pm LOB 302
On December 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 24
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor