+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 88
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 16-3; RC) HC 14 P. 50
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 AM LOB 303
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Environment and Agriculture HJ 4 P. 16
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/02/2016 11:00 AM LOB 303
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor