+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/11/2020 HJ 7 P. 29
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 10 P. 17
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm LOB 306
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am LOB 306
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2020 11:30 am LOB 306
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2020 10:00 am LOB 306
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 10:00 am LOB 301-303
On December 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 1 P. 24