+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 21, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/21/2024 HJ 9 P. 10
On March 12, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/06/2024 (Vote 19-1; CC)
On February 27, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/06/2024 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/14/2024 11:15 am LOB 206-208
On December 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary HJ 1 P. 22
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor