+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 22, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2024; Chapter 200; eff. 01/01/2025
On June 27, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16
On June 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/22/2024; SJ 14
On May 14, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 20
On April 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:00 am; SC 15
On April 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 8
On March 28, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1038h: AA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 93
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1038h: MA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 93
On March 20, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1038h 03/13/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 12 P. 17
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:30 am LOB 305
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/21/2024 11:00 am LOB 305
On December 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development HJ 1 P. 22
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor