+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 05/05/2016; SJ 16
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/05/2016; SC 17
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/21/2016, Room 103, SH, 01:45 pm; SC 15
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 10
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0712h: MA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 160
- Amendment #2016-0712h: AA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 160
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HC 14 P. 59
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0712h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 11-9; RC) HC 14 P. 59
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 AM LOB 208
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Judiciary HJ 4 P. 16
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/16/2016 10:00 AM LOB 208
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor