+ − Actions (22)
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Goley): MA DV 297-20 06/30/2020 HJ 10 P. 62
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 2020-1423s and 2020-1521s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; SJ 8
- Sen. Rosenwald Floor Amendment # 2020-1521s, AA, VV; 06/16/2020; SJ 8
- Committee Amendment # 2020-1423s, AA, VV; 06/16/2020; SJ 8
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1423s, 06/16/2020; SC 23
On June 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Remote Hearing: 06/09/2020, 02:35 pm; SC 22
- Remote Hearing: 06/09/2020, 02:40 pm, on proposed amendment # 2020-1385s; SC 22
- Committee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. SC 22
- Members of the public may attend using the following links: SC 22
- 1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_h44WQAbGQY2sJ8jzW9buaA SC 22
- 2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us SC 22
- 3. To listen via telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 SC 22
- 4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13126266799,,96977679197# or +19292056099,,96977679197# SC 22
- 5. Webinar ID: 969 7767 9197 SC 22
- 6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA SC 22
- The following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). SC 22
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/12/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 8
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/11/2020 HJ 7 P. 29
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 10 P. 16
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am LOB 306
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 01:30 pm LOB 306
On December 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 1 P. 24
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor